THE CYNTHIA WALKER CHARITABLE TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Charity has opted not to give the Commission a brief description of it activities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2009
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 07 July 1972: Standard registration
- 09 October 2011: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2005 | 05/04/2006 | 05/04/2007 | 05/04/2008 | 05/04/2009 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £3.17k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £235 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2009 | 16 June 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2009 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2008 | 16 September 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2008 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 18TH FEBRUARY 1972
Charitable objects
THE APPLICATION OR APPROPRIATION OF THE TRUST FUNDS TO OR FOR THE PURPOSES OF ELIGIBLE CHARITABLE BODIES ASSOCIATIONS AND ORGANISATIONS IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AT THE ABSOLUTE DISCRETION OF THE TRUSTEES.
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window