Financial history THE TOWN LAND

Charity number: 264048
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £3.11k £1.71k £1.44k £1.44k £1.04k
Total expenditure £2.00k £48 £1.06k £100 £5.35k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A