THE TELLISFORD R W BAKER, CRABB AND BOUCHER TRUSTS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The trust exists to provide support to the poor of the village and to provide support to the church.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Somerset
Governance
- 13 June 1972: Standard registration
- BAKER TRUST (Working name)
- THE BAKER TRUST (Working name)
- REV RICHARD WHITTINGTON BAKER CHARITY (Previous name)
- Investment
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Noel Dawson | Trustee | 06 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
RACHEL MARY FEILDEN | Trustee | 06 June 2018 |
|
|||||
Charlie Maltby | Trustee | 17 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
Rev JEREMY MICHAEL YOUNG | Trustee | 30 July 2012 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN CLARE DREDGE | Trustee | 23 July 2012 |
|
|
||||
LADY HELEN ANNE CURWEN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.63k | £3.27k | £2.21k | £1.95k | £2.88k | |
|
Total expenditure | £440 | £7.81k | £110 | £1.11k | £674 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 26 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 05 December 2023 | 35 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 29 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 15 November 2021 | 15 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 20 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 26 NOVEMBER 1965 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION PASSED ON 19 NOVEMBER 1996 UNDER SECTION 74(C) OF THE CHARITIES ACT 1993
Charitable objects
A) THE MAINTENANCE OF TELLISFORD PARISH CHURCH AND CHURCHYARD FOR THE GENERAL BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE VILLAGE B) THE EDUCATION IN THE TENETS OF THE ESTABLISHED CHURCH AND ALSO FOR THE GENERAL BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF TELLISFORD VILLAGE IN SUCH CHARITABLE WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF TELLISFORD
Contact information
- Address:
-
12 Steerforth Street
London
SW18 4HH
- Phone:
- 01373831616
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window