Trustees THE BRITISH SIMMENTAL CATTLE SOCIETY LIMITED
Charity number: 264090

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Richard Price | Trustee | 20 October 2024 |
|
|||||
Richard Michael Sinclair Pettit | Trustee | 22 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Robert Henry Evans | Trustee | 22 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Richard Alan David Rodgers | Trustee | 22 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
John Andrew Barlow | Trustee | 18 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Richard Storer Smith | Trustee | 26 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Adrian Ivory | Trustee | 26 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Andrew William Clarke | Trustee | 26 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dafydd Ellis Jones | Trustee | 26 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Christopher William Martindale | Trustee | 20 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Barrie Robert Wynter | Trustee | 21 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Michael Stuart Durno | Trustee | 21 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Alan Norman Robson | Trustee | 20 October 2014 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.