THE SIR ROBERT GOOCH TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objects of the charity are to make grants to any charities and for any charitable purpose as the Trustees feel appropriate.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Armed Forces/emergency Service Efficiency
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Birmingham City
- Dudley
- Norfolk
- Solihull
- Suffolk
Governance
- 22 November 1972: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CHARLES ROBERT GILLETT | Trustee | 18 March 2015 |
|
|||
Victoria Vere Nicoll | Trustee | 18 June 2014 |
|
|||
LADY SUSAN BARBARA CHRISTIE GOOCH | Trustee |
|
||||
LUCINDA HUTSON MVO | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £32.91k | £31.52k | £30.91k | £38.25k | £46.16k | |
|
Total expenditure | £36.22k | £28.31k | £36.46k | £43.76k | £45.91k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 16 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 16 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 13 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 13 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 29 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 29 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 23 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 23 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 18 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 18 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 1ST MAY 1972
Charitable objects
TO SUCH CHARITIES OR SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES AND IN SUCH PROPORTIONS AND IN SUCH MANNER AND SUBJECT TO SUCH TERMS AND CONDITIONS AS THE SETTLOR MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BY NOTICE IN WRITING DIRECT AND SUBJECT TO AND IN THE DEFAULT OF ANY SUCH DIRECTION AND IN SO FAR AS SUCH DIRECTION MAY NOT EXTEND AS THE TRUSTEES MAY AT THEIR UNCONTROLLED DISCRETION DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE ESTATE OFFICE
HALL FARM
BENACRE
BECCLES
SUFFOLK
NR34 7LJ
- Phone:
- 01502675029
- Email:
- victoriavn@benacre.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window