Accounts and annual returns THE CORAL ATKINS HOME LIMITED

Charity number: 264098
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2009 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2009 Not submitted
Annual return 31 May 2008 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2008 Not submitted
Annual return 31 May 2007 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2007 Not submitted
Annual return 31 May 2006 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2006 Not submitted
Annual return 31 May 2005 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2005 Not submitted