PAUL LUNN-ROCKLIFFE CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The object of the Charity is to make grants to any charity for any charitable purpose, at the Trustees' discretion, but preferably to those recipients likely to further Christianity, support the relief of poverty and assist the aged and infirm.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
- Costa Rica
- India
- Kenya
- Tanzania
- Uganda
- Zimbabwe
Governance
- 02 June 1972: Standard registration
- PLR Trust (Working name)
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JAMES WILLIAM LUNN-ROCKLIFFE | Chair |
|
||||||
Dr Samuel Paul Lunn-Rockliffe | Trustee | 28 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Claire Madeleine Lunn-Rockliffe | Trustee | 28 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Graeme Roderick Holmes Hamsphire | Trustee | 28 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Lucy Lunn-Rockliffe | Trustee | 09 January 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £56.47k | £42.47k | £49.40k | £44.51k | £57.05k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.01k | £128.66k | £119.61k | £138.76k | £80.18k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 12 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 12 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 05 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 05 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 03 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 03 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 03 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 03 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 27 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 27 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 13TH APRIL 1972
Charitable objects
TO PAY OR APPLY THE CAPITAL AND INCOME OF THE TRUST FUND TO SUCH CHARITIES OR FOR SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY DETERMINE.(SEE FURTHER CLAUSE 2 OF TRUT DEED DATED 13 APRIL 1972)
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
42 Manor Lane
Slyne
LANCASTER
LA2 6JE
- Phone:
- 02380 001049
- Email:
- info.plrtrust@gmail.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window