THE GUARANTORS OF BRAIN
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The object of the Charity is to promote the teaching of and the research into the science of neurology or for furthering any other scientific and charitable purpose.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Ireland
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 13 June 1972: Standard registration
- 17 April 2025: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 17 April 2025: Funds transferred to 1197319 THE GUARANTORS OF BRAIN
- THE GUARANTORS OF "BRAIN" (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.07m | £1.42m | £2.06m | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.28m | £950.52k | £1.41m | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £850.81k | £1.23m | £1.88m | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £212.79k | £167.98k | £159.95k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £6.42k | £15.88k | £22.58k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £1.24m | £850.08k | £1.36m | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £48.08k | £100.45k | £57.32k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £27.10k | £20.67k | £41.78k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £1.02m | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £47.02k | £100.45k | £57.32k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 16 April 2025 | 75 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 16 April 2025 | 441 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 22 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 22 January 2023 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 18 January 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 08 February 2021 | 8 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 16 February 2021 | 16 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF THE 13TH FEBRUARY 1975
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE TEACHING OF AND RESEARCH INTO THE SCIENCE OF NEUROLOGY OR FOR FURTHERING ANY OTHER SCIENTIFIC AND CHARITABLE PURPOSE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window