PENWITH GALLERIES LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Operation of gallery for showing of visual and 3D arts & provision of affordable studio space
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Cornwall
Governance
- 25 September 1972: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Percival Ross WILLIAMS | Chair | 08 March 2014 |
|
|||||||||||||
Aidan Philip Hicks | Trustee | 10 July 2024 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Michael Nelhams | Trustee | 20 December 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Julie Wingfield | Trustee | 20 December 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Huw Thomas Leaper | Trustee | 01 April 2021 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Jill Elizabeth George | Trustee | 15 April 2020 |
|
|
||||||||||||
David John Elliott | Trustee | 02 March 2020 |
|
|
||||||||||||
David Edward Try | Trustee | 13 January 2020 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Dr Mark Robert Watson | Trustee | 31 December 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £125.74k | £170.32k | £214.52k | £172.83k | £224.26k | |
|
Total expenditure | £107.65k | £124.32k | £142.98k | £149.21k | £165.85k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £35.55k | £16.94k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 21 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 21 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 29 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 09 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 09 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 05 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 05 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 10 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 10 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 22ND AUGUST 1972
Charitable objects
A) THE ADVANCEMENT OF PUBLIC EDUCATION IN THE UNITED KINGDOM OF GREAT BRITAIN AND NORTHERN IRELAND AND IN PARTICULAR BY ENCOURAGING THE PRACTICE AND DISSEMINATING KNOWLEDGE OFTHE ARTS AND CRAFTS IN GENERAL BUT WITH PARTICULAR REGARD TO CONTEMPORARY PAINTING, SCULPTURE AND OTHER VISUAL ARTS. B) TO AWARD SCHOLARSHIP, PRIZES OR GRANTS IN AID TO ARTISTS IN NEED OF TRAINING AND FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE.
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM OF GREAT BRITAIN AND NORTHERN IRELAND
Contact information
- Address:
-
Penwith Galleries Ltd
Back Road West
ST. IVES
Cornwall
TR26 1NL
- Phone:
- 01736 795579
- Email:
- mail@penwithgallery.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window