THE CATHERINE LEWIS FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
GRANTS ARE ONLY MADE TO UK ORGANISATIONS WHO HAVE CHARITABLE STATUS WITH A REGISTERED CHARITY NUMBER IN THE FIELDS MENTIONED IN A13.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 26 June 1972: Standard registration
- THE DAVID LEWIS CHARITABLE FOUNDATION LIMITED (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAVID JOHN LEWIS | Chair |
|
||||||
H S LEWIS | Trustee |
|
||||||
HANNAH LEWIS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JANE CHARLOTTE SHASHA NEE LEWIS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
NATALIE RUTH PLASKOW | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £39.38k | £128.56k | £1.76k | £8.24k | £2.67k | |
|
Total expenditure | £16.50k | £9.74k | £24.08k | £15.03k | £5.23k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 20 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 17 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 04 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 15 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 15 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 24 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 25 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 24TH MARCH 1972 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 25TH MARCH 1991 as amended on 09 Oct 2019
Charitable objects
(1) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY. (2) THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS. (3) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION. (4) SUCH OTHER PURPOSES AS ARE CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW FOR THE TIME BEING IN FORCE IN ENGLAND AND WALES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
CATHERINE HOUSE
76 GLOUCESTER PLACE
LONDON
W1U 6HJ
- Phone:
- 02074873401
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window