Financial history THE LYNNE AUSTIN MEMORIAL TRUST

Charity number: 264204
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2004 05/04/2006 05/04/2007 05/04/2008 05/04/2009
Total gross income £127 £201 £146 £173 £112
Total expenditure £230 £0 £5.00k £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A