THE NAUTICAL ARCHAEOLOGY SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The NAS is dedicated to advancing education in nautical archaeology at all levels; to improving techniques in excavating, conservation and reporting; and to encouraging the participation of members of the public at all stages.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

15 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Argentina
- Australia
- Canada
- Croatia
- Cyprus
- Egypt
- Finland
- Germany
- Italy
- Mexico
- Philippines
- Scotland
- South Africa
- Thailand
- United States
- Vietnam
Governance
- 05 July 1972: Standard registration
- 24 September 2024: Funds received from 1166504 THE LONDON SHIPWRECK TRUST
- NAS (Working name)
- THE NAUTICAL ARCHAEOLOGY TRUST LIMITED (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Timothy Stephen Parker | Chair | 05 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
Evelin Eros | Trustee | 04 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Deeksha Ravindra Baraddi | Trustee | 20 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Anne Louise Riley | Trustee | 20 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Paul Charles Harwood | Trustee | 20 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Michael Curtis | Trustee | 13 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Holt | Trustee | 14 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Geoff Downer | Trustee | 16 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Alex Denny | Trustee | 18 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Alison James | Trustee | 09 May 2018 |
|
|||||
Anthony Norman Taylor | Trustee | 18 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Dr DAMIAN JASON ROBINSON | Trustee | 05 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
Claire Louise Hallybone | Trustee | 05 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL VERDUN WILLIAMS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr DAVID JOHNSTON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £277.65k | £280.40k | £176.36k | £168.44k | £190.38k | |
|
Total expenditure | £273.00k | £163.74k | £240.12k | £227.06k | £155.58k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 05 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 05 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 30 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 12 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 12 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 21 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 21 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 02 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 02 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED THE 21 JANUARY 1972 AS AMENDED 27 AUGUST 1986, 29 NOVEMBER 2004 AND 7 NOVEMBER 2008 AND 7 NOVEMBER 2009 as amended on 20 Dec 2022
Charitable objects
TO FURTHER RESEARCH IN NAUTICAL ARCHAEOLOGY AND PUBLISH THE RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH AND TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TRAINING IN THE TECHNIQUES PERTAINING TO THE STUDY OF NAUTICAL ARCHAEOLOGY FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
NAUTICAL ARCHAEOLOGY SOCIETY
FORT CUMBERLAND
EASTNEY
PORTSMOUTH
PO4 9LD
- Phone:
- 02392818419
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window