THE LOKE WAN THO MEMORIAL FOUNDATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
This Charity operates by making grants to organisations including charities/voluntary bodies and the general public.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 04 April 2014
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England
- Hong Kong
- Malaysia
Governance
- 31 July 1972: Standard registration
- 22 February 2016: Removed (Transfer of funds)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2010 | 05/04/2011 | 05/04/2012 | 05/04/2013 | 04/04/2014 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £113.73k | £115.04k | £130.92k | £146.26k | £142.93k | |
|
Total expenditure | £61.29k | £92.73k | £94.32k | £105.48k | £121.30k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 04 April 2014 | 30 January 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 April 2014 | 30 January 2015 | On Time | |
Annual return | 05 April 2013 | 14 January 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2013 | 14 January 2014 | On Time | |
Annual return | 05 April 2012 | 01 February 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2012 | 01 February 2013 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 19TH MAY 1972
Charitable objects
SUCH CHARITABLE INSTITUTIONS OR PURPOSES IN ANY PART OR PARTS OF THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
WORLDWIDE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window