HEALTHAID ROYSTON

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Financial support for people living in Royston and District who need healthcare not provided at NHS expense.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Cambridgeshire
- Essex
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 08 August 1972: Standard registration
- HEALTHAID ROYSTON (Working name)
- FRIENDS OF ROYSTON AND DISTRICT HEALTHCARE (Previous name)
- FRIENDS OF ROYSTON AND DISTRICT HOSPITAL (Previous name)
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
NEIL VERNON GUTTRIDGE | Chair | 19 August 2013 |
|
|||||
Clarice Margaret Wahlich | Trustee | 18 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
DAVID SMYTH | Trustee | 04 July 2024 |
|
|||||
Diana Mary Walters | Trustee | 04 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Sylvia Stanlick | Trustee | 20 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
MARTIN DAVID LEWIS | Trustee | 05 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
VIVIENNE MARY TADMAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JENNY MARGARET ROUTLEDGE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR PETER HOMENT | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £43.62k | £3.89k | £3.69k | £13.88k | £19.37k | |
|
Total expenditure | £74.13k | £45.24k | £24.19k | £23.25k | £10.83k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 17 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 16 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 21 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 13 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 16 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 16 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES ADOPTED 15/06/1972 AS AMENDED ON 30/06/2006 AS AMENDED ON 13/11/2014
Charitable objects
TO ASSIST WITH THE SUPPORT OF THOSE LIVING IN ROYSTON AND THE SURROUNDING VILLAGES WHO NEED MEDICAL CARE OR TREATMENT.
Area of benefit
ROYSTON AND THE SURROUNDING VILLAGES
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 Foxglove Bank
ROYSTON
Hertfordshire
SG8 9TH
- Phone:
- 07870314258
- Email:
- cath_stanlick@hotmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window