THE PHYTOCHEMICAL SOCIETY OF EUROPE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
In April 2014, the PSE organised a congress on Phytochemicals in Medicine and Pharmacognosy in Piatra Neamt, Romania. In June 2014, a meeting on Future Trends in Phytochemistry was held in Olomouc,Czech Republic. In September 2014, the PSE co-organised the 22nd Conference on Isoprenoids in Prague,Czech Republic. Prizes to support young and established scientists were awarded during these meetings.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 15 January 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
9 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Austria
- Czech Republic
- Finland
- France
- Hungary
- Ireland
- Italy
- Romania
- Scotland
- Spain
Governance
- 24 August 1972: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Investment
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Miroslav STRNAD | Chair | 10 September 2012 |
|
|
||||
Dr Kenneth Ritchie | Trustee | 21 June 2019 |
|
|||||
Dr veronique SEIDEL | Trustee | 01 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
Dr FRANCISCO MACIAS | Trustee | 27 June 2013 |
|
|
||||
Dr FRANZ BUCAR | Trustee | 10 September 2012 |
|
|
||||
Dr PINAROSA AVATO | Trustee | 10 September 2012 |
|
|
||||
Dr RANDOLPH ARROO | Trustee | 14 June 2011 |
|
|
||||
Dr SIMON GIBBONS | Trustee | 01 January 2010 |
|
|
||||
Dr ANGELA Darlington | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 15/01/2020 | 15/01/2021 | 15/01/2022 | 15/01/2023 | 15/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £28.21k | £49.71k | £27.40k | £28.20k | £33.44k | |
|
Total expenditure | £19.06k | £8.30k | £35.89k | £11.60k | £30.75k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 15 January 2024 | 13 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
15 January 2024
(These accounts |
13 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 15 January 2023 | 14 March 2024 | 120 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 15 January 2023 | 14 March 2024 | 120 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 15 January 2022 | 23 November 2022 | 8 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 15 January 2022 | 23 November 2022 | 8 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 15 January 2021 | 15 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 15 January 2021 | 15 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 15 January 2020 | 28 April 2021 | 164 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 15 January 2020 | 28 April 2021 | 164 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES ADOPTED 11TH APRIL 1967
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE KNOWLEDGE OF THE CONSTITUENTS OF PLANTS IN RESPECT OF THEIR CHEMISTRY, FUNCTION, BIOSYNTHESIS, EFFECT ON PLANT AND ANIMAL PHYSIOLOGY AND PATHOLOGY, AND THE APPLICATION OF SUCH KNOWLEDGE IN AGRICULTURE AND INDUSTRY. TO PUBLISH PAPERS DELIVERED AT MEETINGS OF THE SOCIETY WITH A VIEW TO THE DISSEMINATION OF THE KNOWLEDGE SO GAINED FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC GENERALLY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
James Parsons Building
Byrom Street
Liverpool
Liverpool
Merseyside
L3 3AF
- Phone:
- 00441512312219
- Email:
- k.j.ritchie@ljmu.ac.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window