TONBRIDGE MUSIC CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Educating the public in the art and science of music by the presentation of concerts by internationally renowned musicians, young performers together with other allied activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Kent
Governance
- 25 August 1972: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mrs P M Gane | Chair | 04 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
ROGER GOLLAND | Trustee | 22 June 2020 |
|
|||||
Kenneth Morgan | Trustee | 26 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Kathryn Elwick | Trustee | 26 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jan Trayner | Trustee | 04 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Davies | Trustee | 04 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
DILYS BENSON | Trustee | 04 July 2008 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.22k | £2.74k | £11.15k | £20.81k | £19.99k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.29k | £1.04k | £9.43k | £18.74k | £26.06k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 12 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 20 June 2024 | 81 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 01 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 21 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 04 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 16TH JUNE 1972 AS AMENDED ON 1ST JULY 1998
Charitable objects
TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN THE ARTS AND SCIENCES, AND IN PARTICULAR THE ART AND SCIENCE OF MUSIC BY THE PRESENTATION OF CONCERTS AND OTHER ACTIVITIES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
27 Vauxhall Gardens
TONBRIDGE
Kent
TN11 0LZ
- Phone:
- 07812495020
- Email:
- tmc@tmc.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window