AGE CONCERN HARLOW

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The aims and objectives of the group are to further charitable purposes for the benefit of the elderly in the district of Harlow. In furtherance of these objectives to co-ordinate and supplement the work of all those whose interest is in the care and happiness of the aged in Harlow.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- Recreation
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Essex
Governance
- 11 November 1971: Standard registration
- 18 December 2023: Funds received from 1091058 AGE CONCERN ESSEX
- HARLOW SENIOR CITIZENS COUNCIL (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Donna Kiff | Trustee | 28 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mike James | Trustee | 19 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
David Tregunno | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £36.07k | £27.06k | £21.46k | £25.85k | £83.41k | |
|
Total expenditure | £32.48k | £23.95k | £27.89k | £30.73k | £29.57k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £15.00k | £15.00k | £10.00k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 05 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2024
(These accounts |
11 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 May 2024 | 119 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 29 May 2024 | 119 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 05 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 05 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 19 February 2021 | 19 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 19 February 2021 | 19 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 11 NOVEMBER 1971 AS AMENDED 20 MARCH 1972, 28 JUNE 1993, 25TH NOVEMBER 2002 AND 28 JULY 2006.
Charitable objects
TO FURTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE ELDERLY IN THE DISTRICT OF HARLOW AND IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS TO CO-ORDINATE AND SUPPLEMENT THE WORK OF ALL THOSE WHOSE INTEREST IS THE CARE AND HAPPINESS OF THE ELDERLY IN THE DISTRICT OF HARLOW
Area of benefit
THE URBAN DISTRICT OF HARLOW
Contact information
- Address:
-
Leah Manning Centre
Park Lane
HARLOW
CM20 2QJ
- Phone:
- 01279 415553
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window