THE SIR EDWARD LEWIS FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To or towards or for the benefit or in furtherance of such charitable purposes charitable institutions or charitable foundations in such countries and in such manner and in such proportions as the trustees may from time to time in their discretion determine.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Armed Forces/emergency Service Efficiency
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Surrey
- Throughout London
Governance
- 25 October 1972: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Christopher John Alfred Noel Lewis | Trustee | 17 June 2020 |
|
|||||
David Edward Noel Lewis | Trustee | 17 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
MARK HARRIS | Trustee | 21 March 2013 |
|
|||||
SARAH JANE NOEL DORIN | Trustee | 12 March 1999 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £289.65k | £230.30k | £277.11k | £285.37k | £251.86k | |
|
Total expenditure | £307.53k | £285.87k | £287.61k | £299.30k | £262.98k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 05 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 05 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 05 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 05 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 02 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 02 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 19 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 01 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 25 February 2021 | 20 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED THE 19TH JULY 1972
Charitable objects
TO OR TOWARDS OR FOR THE BENEFIT OR IN FURTHERANCE OF SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES CHARITABLE INSTITUTIONS OR CHARITABLE FOUNDATIONS IN SUCH COUNTRIES AND IN SUCH MANNER AND IN SUCH PROPORTIONS AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME IN THEIR DISCRETION DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
EIGHTH FLOOR
6 NEW STREET SQUARE
NEW FETTER LANE
LONDON
EC4A 3AQ
- Phone:
- 02078422000
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window