Governance PHYLLIS TUCKWELL MEMORIAL HOSPICE LTD
Charity number: 264501

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Registration history:
- 08 September 1972: Standard registration
- 06 May 2014: Funds received from 1024866 HOSPICE HOME SUPPORT
- 12 July 2022: Funds received from 257972 IDA MORTLOCK SADLER TRUST
- 12 December 2022: Funds received from 803097 THE TINDLE FAMILY CHARITY
- 13 May 2025: Funds received from 1083261 THE INNER WHEEL CLUB OF ALDERSHOT BENEVOLENT FUND
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
- PHYLLIS TUCKWELL HOSPICE (Working name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
- Care Quality Commission
Policies:
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.