THE BODDINGTON VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The main activity is hiring out the facilities for sports, recreation & wellbeing activities for all ages and abilities and holding fundraising & community events such as fireworks, film club, seniors Christmas lunch and the Friday cafe. Monies raised are used for running and improving the hall to ensure its maintenance, short and long term, for the benefit of the Boddingtons & surrounding areas
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

15 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Northamptonshire
- Oxfordshire
- Warwickshire
Governance
- 07 August 1963: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CAROLINE EDITH SHEERS | Chair | 01 February 2012 |
|
|
||||
Sheila Ann Smith | Trustee | 09 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Janet Alison King | Trustee | 09 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Anne Baxter | Trustee | 09 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Didier Ramsden | Trustee | 09 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Masha Lucy Twemlow | Trustee | 09 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Claire Rachel Thorp | Trustee | 09 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Edward Haldane Morgan Preston | Trustee | 08 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Alison Elizabeth Burton | Trustee | 17 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Alan Sheers | Trustee | 17 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
ANNE FRANCES FAWDRY WADLAND | Trustee | 17 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
CLARE TOWNSEND | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
STEPHEN JOHN BARNARD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARTYN IAN WILKIE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MRS. M. G. BARNARD | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £69.74k | £30.40k | £70.04k | £85.29k | £112.36k | |
|
Total expenditure | £65.01k | £30.82k | £56.12k | £76.62k | £74.90k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £20.64k | £12.17k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 23 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 23 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE AND TRUST DEED DATED 7 AUGUST 1963 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 18TH MARCH 2002
Charitable objects
FOR THE PURPOSES OF A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF BODDINGTON AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS AND IN PARTICULAR FOR USE FOR MEETINGS LECTURES AND CLASSES AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS
Area of benefit
PARISH OF BODDINGTON AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
Boddington Village Hall
Warwick Road
Upper Boddington
DAVENTRY
Northamptonshire
NN11 6DH
- Phone:
- 01327720025
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window