BISHOP'S STORTFORD CIVIC FEDERATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Representing Bishop's Stortford residents and individual/corporate members in matters affecting the town as a whole, and in particular relating to planning, transport and the environment.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Essex
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 28 September 1972: Standard registration
- BISHOP'S STORTFORD CIVIC SOCIETY (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Paul Dean | Chair | 19 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Pook | Trustee | 04 May 2022 |
|
|||||
Colin Arnott | Trustee | 26 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
JOHN ANDREW RHODES | Trustee | 19 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
MARIE CATHERINE RHODES | Trustee | 03 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
JAMES GRAINGER | Trustee | 03 November 2013 |
|
|
||||
DEBORAH MUNRO | Trustee | 20 August 2011 |
|
|
||||
JILL WADE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ALYSON BAILEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANTHEA WYATT | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.22k | £1.93k | £1.30k | £1.19k | £918 | |
|
Total expenditure | £704 | £2.78k | £661 | £1.69k | £1.03k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 17 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 06 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 27 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 28 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 11 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 22ND MARCH 1972, AS AMENDED 19 APRIL 2006. AS AMENDED ON 03/04/2014 AS AMENDED ON 23/04/2015 as amended on 22 Apr 2021
Charitable objects
1) The purpose of the Civic Federation is to promote, for the public benefit, the improvement of Bishop's Stortford and its surroundings particularly but not exclusively by: a) Examining proposed developments in the town on behalf of members, and commenting on them. b) Informing members of various developments/issues. c) Providing a social media site to provide updates and an overview of residents' opinions. d) Acting as an umbrella organisation for the town's Residents' Associations
Area of benefit
THE TOWN OF BISHOP'S STORTFORD AND ITS SURROUNDINGS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
125 RYE STREET
BISHOP'S STORTFORD
CM23 2HD
- Phone:
- 01279659960
- Email:
- stortfordcf@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window