THE DUKE OF WELLINGTON'S REGIMENT REGIMENTAL AND JOURNAL FUND

Charity number: 264601
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To promote the efficiency of the regiment and maintain its traditions and Esprit de Corps, in particular, but not exclusively, by publishing a journal of the regiment or it's battalions.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £6,559
Total expenditure: £7,253

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Calderdale

Governance

Registration history:
  • 11 October 1972: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • IRON DUKE FUND (Working name)
  • THE IRON DUKE (Working name)
  • THE DUKE OF WELLINGTON'S REGIMENT JOURNAL FUND (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Investment
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Brigadier Andrew Donisthorpe Meek CBE Chair 21 November 2013
THE FRIENDS OF THE DUKE OF WELLINGTON'S REGIMENT
Received: On time
Lt Col Andrew Herbert Schofield Drake MBE Trustee 06 June 2018
THE FRIENDS OF THE DUKE OF WELLINGTON'S REGIMENT
Received: On time
Major Patrick Martin Ennis Trustee 20 February 2014
THE FRIENDS OF THE DUKE OF WELLINGTON'S REGIMENT
Received: On time
MAJOR DAVID LOUIS JOHN HARRAP Trustee
THE HUDDERSFIELD DRILL HALL AND TRUST FUND
Received: On time
THE REGIMENTAL MUSEUM TRUST OF THE DUKE OF WELLINGTON'S REGIMENT (WEST RIDING)
Received: On time
THE FRIENDS OF THE DUKE OF WELLINGTON'S REGIMENT
Received: On time
COLONEL SIMON CHARLES NEWTON MBE Trustee
THE FRIENDS OF THE DUKE OF WELLINGTON'S REGIMENT
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £7.77k £3.36k £3.18k £5.09k £6.56k
Total expenditure £7.24k £3.02k £4.06k £5.07k £7.25k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 14 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 23 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 27 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 01 February 2022 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 26 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
THE DUKE OF WELLINGTON REGIMENT
BANKFIELD MUSEUM
BOOTHTOWN ROAD
HALIFAX
HX3 6HG
Phone:
01422356759