LUTON MUSIC CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Education and training in arts and culture
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Bedford
- Central Bedfordshire
- Hertfordshire
- Luton
Governance
- 16 October 1972: Standard registration
- MUSIC ON MONDAYS (Working name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
RICHARD PHILIP SISSON | Chair | 24 September 2012 |
|
|
||||
Dr Wendy Butler | Trustee | 20 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Paul James Cott | Trustee | 12 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
James Wilson | Trustee | 08 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
JOAN MARGARET DRAGE | Trustee | 09 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL THOMAS SUGARS | Trustee | 24 September 2012 |
|
|
||||
MIKE ATKINSON | Trustee | 29 April 2008 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.54k | £21.38k | £13.76k | £32.69k | £30.47k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.52k | £20.52k | £28.83k | £29.94k | £32.71k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 05 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 05 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 21 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 21 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 05 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 02 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 17 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION AND RULES ADOPTED THE 7TH FEBRUARY 1972 AS AMENDED 24TH APRIL 1995 AND 27TH APRIL 1998. as amended on 30 Apr 2018 as amended on 30 Apr 2018 as amended on 20 May 2024
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE, IMPROVE, DEVELOP AND MAINTAIN PUBLIC EDUCATION IN AND APPRECIATION OF THE ART AND SCIENCE OF MUSIC IN ALL ITS ASPECTS BY THE PRESENTATION OF PUBLIC CONCERTS AND RECITALS. THE CLUB WILL OPERATE IN SUCH A MANNER AS TO BE REGARDED AS A CHARITABLE BODY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
19 St. Bartholomews Court
Riverside
CAMBRIDGE
CB5 8JB
- Phone:
- 01223311563
- Email:
- LutonMusicClub@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window