TAXI CHARITY FOR MILITARY VETERANS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To organise outings, both in the United Kingdom and abroad, entertainment, transport and other support for any serviceman or woman who is a veteran of the Armed Forces. To assist in the care of former servicemen and women who are disabled, elderly, infirm, impoverished, lonely or otherwise in need of charitable assistance by making grants of money for providing or paying for items or services.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
Total income includes £22,000 from 2 government grant(s)
People

11 Trustee(s)
120 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- Recreation
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout London
- Belgium
- France
- Netherlands
Governance
- 30 October 1972: Standard registration
- TAXICHARITY FOR MILITARY VETERANS (Previous name)
- THE LONDON TAXI BENEVOLENT ASSOCIATION FOR WAR DISABLED (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Colin David Mills | Chair | 15 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Daren Parr | Trustee | 10 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Keely Louise Allen | Trustee | 13 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Antony John Neal | Trustee | 15 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Paul Cook | Trustee | 15 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Michael Joseph Harris | Trustee | 13 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Simon Hawes | Trustee | 14 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sebastian Philp | Trustee | 08 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
IAN CALVIN PARSONS | Trustee | 12 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
MR DICK GOODWIN | Trustee | 14 November 2006 |
|
|
||||
TERENCE WILLIAM WARD | Trustee | 12 March 1994 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £147.12k | £94.18k | £127.80k | £249.21k | £457.14k | |
|
Total expenditure | £127.00k | £98.15k | £238.02k | £214.40k | £282.09k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £16.36k | £22.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 16 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | 16 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 20 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 20 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 26 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 26 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 07 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 07 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 30 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 30 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES ADOPTED 27/02/1948 AS AMENDED ON 06/03/1956 AS AMENDED ON 21/10/1972 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 07/03/2007 ADOPTED 12/03/2007 AS AMENDED ON 09/02/2015 AS AMENDED ON 09/03/2015 as amended on 09 Nov 2020 as amended on 08 Feb 2021
Charitable objects
(A) TO ORGANISE OUTINGS, ENTERTAINMENT, TRANSPORT AND OTHER SUPPORT FOR FORMER SERVICEMEN AND WOMEN WHO ARE DISABLED, ELDERLY, INFIRM, IMPOVERISHED OR OTHERWISE IN NEED OF CHARITABLE ASSISTANCE. (B) TO ASSIST IN THE TREATMENT AND CARE OF FORMER SERVICEMEN AN WOMEN WHO ARE DISABLED, ELDERLY, INFIRM, IMPOVERISHED OR OTHERWISE IN NEED OF CHARITABLE ASSISTANCE BY MAKING GRANTS OF MONEY FOR PROVIDING OR PAYING FOR ITEMS, SERVICES OR FACILITIES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
13 Musley Hill
WARE
Hertfordshire
SG12 7NA
- Phone:
- 07941 772264
- Email:
- dickgoodwin@taxicharity.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window