Financial history BETTY CAMERON PLAYING FIELD

Charity number: 264702
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £8.95k £199 £1.00k £8.41k £221
Total expenditure £8.12k £3.76k £527 £496 £9.93k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A