FAMILY ACTION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To preserve and protect the good health (in particular the mental health) of children and families, other individuals and groups within the community and to provide services, advice and grants to children, adults and families.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£40,361,000
Donations and legacies | £3.32m | |
Charitable activities | £36.44m | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £610.00k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£39,323,000
Raising funds | £753.00k | |
Charitable activities | £38.57m | |
Other | £0 |
£340,000 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £30,754,147 from 106 government contract(s) and £697,747 from 20 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £753.00k | |
Charitable expenditure | £38.57m | |
Retained for future use | £1.04m |
Raising funds and other expenditure | £753.00k | |
Charitable expenditure | £38.57m | |
Retained for future use | £1.38m |
People

920 Employee(s)
13 Trustee(s)
330 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 6 |
£70k to £80k | 2 |
£80k to £90k | 1 |
£90k to £100k | 3 |
£100k to £110k | 1 |
£150k to £200k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Isle Of Man
Governance
- 27 May 1963: Standard registration
- FNA (Working name)
- FAMILY WELFARE ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- FAMILY WELFARE ASSOCIATION LIMITED (Previous name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Philippa Lisa Kramer | Trustee | 13 February 2025 |
|
|
||||||||||
Louise Turnbull Posocco | Trustee | 15 February 2024 |
|
|
||||||||||
Jennifer Anne Holly | Trustee | 06 July 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||
Katherine Marie Prince | Trustee | 06 July 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||
Caroline Walsh | Trustee | 04 May 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||
Charlotte Heiss | Trustee | 04 May 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||
Melanie Williams Browne | Trustee | 11 February 2021 |
|
|
||||||||||
Ayodele Arogundade | Trustee | 11 February 2021 |
|
|
||||||||||
Dez Holmes | Trustee | 22 March 2018 |
|
|
||||||||||
Ian Raymond Hargrave | Trustee | 22 March 2018 |
|
|||||||||||
Philippe Michael Broadhead | Trustee | 22 March 2018 |
|
|
||||||||||
Paul John Hayes | Trustee | 11 January 2016 |
|
|
||||||||||
ROBERT WILFRID TAPSFIELD | Trustee | 11 January 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £37.29m | £41.07m | £35.23m | £39.00m | £40.36m | |
|
Total expenditure | £35.81m | £38.11m | £32.78m | £36.91m | £39.32m | |
|
Income from government contracts | £30.46m | £31.20m | £24.92m | £28.32m | £30.75m | |
|
Income from government grants | £1.47m | £375.47k | £818.99k | £632.20k | £697.75k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £1.30m | £3.61m | £2.62m | £5.11m | £3.32m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £35.63m | £37.21m | £32.10m | £33.52m | £36.44m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £364.00k | £241.00k | £288.00k | £369.00k | £610.00k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £223.00k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £41.68k | £9.90k | £266.87k | £840.49k | £58.78k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £35.08m | £37.58m | £32.20m | £36.30m | £38.57m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £732.00k | £537.00k | £581.00k | £616.00k | £753.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £31.00k | £32.00k | £32.00k | £40.00k | £40.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £300.00k | £2.90m | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £75.00k | £80.00k | £119.00k | £95.00k | £170.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £6.62m | £4.59m | £4.75m | £4.59m | £4.50m | |
|
Long-term investments | £9.46m | £11.06m | £11.21m | £10.08m | £10.25m | |
|
Other assets | £12.65m | £13.72m | £17.35m | £18.01m | £19.92m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | -£5.46m | -£13.97m | -£12.48m | -£9.68m | -£10.86m | |
|
Total liabilities | £6.17m | £2.54m | £3.95m | £2.33m | £3.00m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 05 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 05 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 18 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 18 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 20 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 20 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 09 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 09 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 04 February 2021 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 17 February 2021 | 17 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 29/08/1972 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 06/05/1976 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 27/11/1985 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 22/11/2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 15/03/2012 AS AMENDED ON 23 APR 2015 AS AMENDED ON 25 APR 2019 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 03 JUN 2019
Charitable objects
3.1 THE OBJECTS FOR WHICH THE CHARITY IS ESTABLISHED ARE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT: 3.1.1 TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT THE GOOD HEALTH (IN PARTICULAR MENTAL HEALTH) AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF FAMILIES, INDIVIDUALS AND GROUPS WITHIN THE COMMUNITY; AND 3.1.2 THE RELIEF OF POVERTY; AND 3.1.3 THE RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED, BY REASON OF YOUTH, AGE, ILL-HEALTH, DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR OTHER DISADVANTAGE; IN SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Linked charities
- BAILWARD TRUST FUND
- BISHOP ANDREWS CHARITY
- BRITISH WAR REFUGEES FUND
- CATERHAM WHYTELEAFE TRUST
- DINNER FUND
- EAST ISLINGTON MOTHERS' AND CHILDRENS' WELFARE FUND
- ELEANOR PONSONBY TRUST
- ELEANOR WATT FUND
- ELIZABETH STACE HOLIDAY FUND
- FAMILY WELFARE ASSOCIATION COMMON INVESTMENT FUND -POOL CHARITY
- FAMILY WELFARE ASSOCIATION GREATER LONDON RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY
- FAMILY WELFARE ASSOCIATION NATIONAL RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY
- FENTON TRUST
- GEORGE HENRY BLAXILL CHARITY
- GERARD BLAKEMAN ATKINS CHARITY
- GREENE BEQUEST FUND
- GUSTAV ADOLPH AND ERNEST KOETTGEN MEMORIAL FUND
- HANNAH MARIA BENSON
- J J JAFFE FUND
- JANE GATLAND
- JOHN CHRISTIAN PRINGLE MEMORIAL FUND
- JOHN CYRIL LEES COLLINGHAM
- KENNEDY AND SCANES RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY
- LADY ST JUST FUND
- LIMPSFIELD CONVALESCENT HOME FUND
- LONDON PHILANTHROPIC SOCIETY
- MARY ELEANOR BENSON MEMORIAL FUND
- MATTHEW WISTRICH TRUST
- MAY AND WALTER MARTIN TRUST
- MERCEDES GLEITZE RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY
- METROPOLITAN VISITING AND RELIEF ASSOCIATION
- MRS M J WILLIAMS FUND
- NATHAN SIMPSON TRUST (ISAAC V DEFRIES FUND)
- OFF CENTRE 25 HACKNEY GROVE LONDON E8
- OVERMAN AND DE BOSSET RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY
- PERCY RATCLIFFE BEQUEST
- QUEEN ADELAIDE'S FUND
- SISTERS TRUST
- SOUTHWARK, NEWINGTON AND WALWORTH RELIEF IN SICKNESS FUND
- THE ALFRED DE ROTHSCHILD CHARITY
- THE CUMBERLAND BENEVOLENT INSTITUTION
- THE CURZON WYLLIE MEMORIAL FUND
- THE FAMILY WELFARE ASSOCIATION RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY FOR THE AGED
- THE FAMILY WELFARE ASSOCIATION RELIEF IN SICKNESS CHARITY
- THE FOSTER FUND
- THE LONDON NOTTINGHAMSHIRE BENEVOLENT FUND
- THE MARGARET CLUB AND DAY NURSERY FUND
- THE MORGAN MENTAL HEALTH TRUST (WILLIAM AND EDITH MORGAN)
- THE NORA HENRY TRUST
- THE PENDLEBURY HOUGHTON FRESH AIR FUND
- THE SKENE KEATING FUND
- THE WOMEN'S LAND ARMY BENEVOLENT FUND
- TOM GODFREY MEMORIAL FUND
- WALTER FRANCIS GLENCAIRN CAMPBELL
- WALTER FREEMAN TRUST
- WEDGEWOOD CHARITY
- WILKINSON'S CHARITY
- WILLIAM LITTLETON MEMORIAL FUND
- WOMEN'S HOLIDAY FUND
- 27 May 1963 : Standard registration
Contact information
- Address:
-
Family Action
34 Wharf Road
LONDON
N1 7GR
- Phone:
- 07917838573
- Email:
- info@family-action.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window