THE OAKSEY CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide help to local groups and community facilities and services that are directly beneficial to, or closely associated with, the village of Oaksey
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 23 November 1972: Standard registration
- OAKSEY TRUST (Working name)
- THE OAKSEY TRUST (Working name)
- Investment
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jonathan Howard Goodfield | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Michael Sidney Martin | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
DIANA MASHITER | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £84 | £49 | £2 | £182 | £848 | |
|
Total expenditure | £500 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £3.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 23 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 23 October 2024 | 358 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 23 October 2024 | 723 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 16 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 16 November 2020 | 16 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 10TH OCTOBER 1972
Charitable objects
CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN ENGLAND, AT DISCRETION OF THE SETTLOR DURING HIS LIFETIME AND OF THE TRUSTEES AFTER HIS DEATH.
Area of benefit
ENGLAND
Contact information
- Address:
-
Old Country Stores
Minety Lane
Oaksey
MALMESBURY
SN16 9SY
- Phone:
- 01666577220
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window