THE CAMBERWELL SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
general charitable purposes
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

12 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Southwark
Governance
- 07 November 1972: Standard registration
No other names
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nick Mair | Chair | 01 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Ben Moxham | Trustee | 06 August 2020 |
|
|||||
Elizabeth Cook | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Coleman | Trustee | 16 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Isabel Begg | Trustee | 01 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
PAOLA TOTARO | Trustee | 27 October 2011 |
|
|
||||
ELIZABETH ALLEN | Trustee | 27 October 2011 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT WAINWRIGHT | Trustee | 27 October 2011 |
|
|
||||
Christopher BLACKWELL | Trustee | 01 January 2008 |
|
|
||||
TIM GAYMER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
NICHOLAS ROSKILL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BARBARA PATTINSON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.28k | £40.39k | £25.42k | £17.41k | £20.43k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.22k | £31.10k | £28.55k | £16.78k | £20.70k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £1.34k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 27 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 02 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 02 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 10 February 2022 | 102 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 02 July 2022 | 244 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 05 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 27TH MAY 1971
Charitable objects
(A) TO STIMULATE PUBLIC INTEREST IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT. (B) TO PROMOTE HIGH STANDARDS OF PLANNING AND ARCHITECTURE IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT. (C) TO SECURE THE PRESERVATION PROTECTION DEVELOPMENT AND IMPROVEMENT OF FEATURES OF HISTORIC OR PUBLIC INTEREST IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT.
Area of benefit
NORTH CAMBERWELL
Contact information
- Address:
-
78 CAMBERWELL GROVE
LONDON
SE5 8RF
- Phone:
- 07767232122
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window