WESTON ON THE GREEN MEMORIAL VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Village committees including WI, Parish Council, Weston Society, Garden Club,training days and courses, Quiz and Film Nights, dancing,social gatherings, talks, concerts
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 January 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Recreation
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 10 November 1972: Standard registration
No other names
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Laura Nicole East | Trustee | 10 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Anna Celia Hamilton-Gould | Trustee | 01 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jordanna RICHES | Trustee | 01 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW WILSON | Trustee | 01 January 2009 |
|
|
||||
Dr PAUL JUSTIN WARREN | Trustee | 10 January 2007 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/01/2020 | 29/01/2021 | 29/01/2022 | 29/01/2023 | 29/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.93k | £22.90k | £39.15k | £27.95k | £15.65k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.38k | £19.87k | £12.81k | £33.70k | £14.92k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | £24.04k | £9.87k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 January 2024 | 06 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 January 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 29 January 2023 | 28 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 January 2023 | 28 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 29 January 2022 | 22 December 2022 | 23 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 January 2022 | 22 December 2022 | 23 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 29 January 2021 | 25 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 January 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 29 January 2020 | 14 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 January 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 10TH APRIL 1972 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 13 SEP 2018
Charitable objects
A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE BENEFICIAL AREA WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, INCLUDING USE FOR MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES, AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
WESTON ON THE GREEN
Contact information
- Address:
-
Village Hall
Mill Lane
Weston-On-The-Green
BICESTER
Oxfordshire
OX25 3QR
- Phone:
- 01869350480
- Email:
- westonvillagehall@live.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window