DOGSTHORPE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We aim to provide services and activities that promote the benefit of the inhabitants of the Dogsthorpe, Bluebell and Welland Estate areas of Peterborough. We provide services that can be used for recreation and leisure or employment and social welfare. Our facitilites are available for use by any inhabitant without discrimination and we aim to accomodate all age groups.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2013
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Peterborough City
Governance
- 20 November 1972: Standard registration
- 21 August 2018: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2009 | 31/03/2010 | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £52.67k | £43.81k | £120.34k | £113.51k | £106.69k | |
|
Total expenditure | £55.56k | £47.61k | £132.56k | £115.84k | £127.32k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 22ND SEPTEMBER 1972
Charitable objects
A) TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF DOGSTHORPE AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS AND INHABITANTS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS. B) TO ESTABLISH OR TO SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE.
Area of benefit
DOGSTHORPE AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window