NORTHERN COUNTIES PONY ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We promote and support educational and recreational facilities for children and adults regardless of their physical or mental ability to enable them to ride, enjoy and learn about horses & ponies. We also participate in prevention of cruelty to all equines, and in improving the standard of horses & ponies by promoting selective breeding and researching matters relevent to equine health.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
104 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Animals
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Throughout England
Governance
- 07 November 1972: Standard registration
- NCPA (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JANICE ANITA FITCHETT | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Beverley Calderbank | Trustee | 12 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sandra Moncaster | Trustee | 01 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Mark Moncater | Trustee | 01 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Ian Dickinson | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Kim Neal | Trustee | 27 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Hall | Trustee | 10 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
JENNIE CRANE | Trustee | 12 October 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £45.18k | £31.68k | £40.46k | £40.71k | £63.23k | |
|
Total expenditure | £43.04k | £30.04k | £34.85k | £34.85k | £48.22k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 24 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 24 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 26 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 26 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 06 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 06 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 09 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 09 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 19 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 19 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED ON 1ST OCTOBER 1972
Charitable objects
A) TO PRESERVE AND IMPROVE THE STANDARD OF HORSES AND PONIES IN GENERAL AND OF THE BRITISH NATIVE BREEDS IN PARTICULAR AND THE BREEDING THEREOF. B) TO PREVENT CRUELTY TO HORSES AND PONIES. C) TO PARTICIPATE IN RESEARCH INTO MATTERS RELATIVE TO EQUINE HEALTH AND OTHER EQUINE PROBLEMS AND TO PUBLIH OR OTHERWISE DISSEMINATE THE RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH. D) TO PROMOTE AND SUPPORT EDUCATIONAL AND RECREATIONAL FACILITES FOR CHILDREN AND ADULTS EITHER PHYSICALLY HANDICAPPED OR MENTALLY RETARDED TO RIDE AND LEARN ABOUT HORSES AND PONIES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
11 Mawdsley Close
Formby
LIVERPOOL
L37 8DJ
- Phone:
- 01704 834482
- Email:
- gensec@thencpa.co.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window