Trustees THE BRITISH ASSOCIATION FOR APPLIED LINGUISTICS
Charity Number: 264800

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
20 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Piotr Wegorowski | Trustee | 06 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Tim Hampson | Trustee | 06 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Peter Browning | Trustee | 06 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Robbie Love | Trustee | 06 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Yi Zhang | Trustee | 24 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Maria Arche | Trustee | 03 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mel Evans | Trustee | 10 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sultan Turkan | Trustee | 10 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sathena Chan | Trustee | 10 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Pawel Szudarski | Trustee | 10 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sin-Wang Chong | Trustee | 10 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Wicaksono | Trustee | 10 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Zhu Hua | Trustee | 09 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Vander Viana | Trustee | 30 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
Gee Macrory | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Sal Consoli | Trustee | 09 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Tagg | Trustee | 05 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
Dr Bettina Beinhoff | Trustee | 03 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
Glenn Stewart Hadikin | Trustee | 03 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
DR Ho Cheong LEUNG | Trustee | 04 September 2014 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.