HOUNSLOW JAMIA MASJID AND ISLAMIC CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Trust's main objective is to promote Islam especially the Sunni Faith, it also provides Funeral services for the community and also educational needs in the Suffah Primary School, which is run by an Educational Committee consisting of four members of the Trust.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
Total income:
£1,773,104
Donations and legacies | £766.90k | |
Charitable activities | £812.75k | |
Other trading activities | £192.26k | |
Investments | £0 | |
Other | £1.19k |
Total expenditure:
£1,751,788
Raising funds | £301.18k | |
Charitable activities | £1.45m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £46,856 from 1 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £301.18k | |
Charitable expenditure | £1.45m | |
Retained for future use | £21.32k |
People

56 Employee(s)
11 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Hounslow
Governance
- 09 January 1974: Standard registration
- HOUNSLOW JAMIA MASJID (Previous name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
RAJA GHAZANFAR ALI | Chair | 13 December 2011 |
|
|
||||
Sajid Ali | Trustee | 06 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Tariq Masood | Trustee | 06 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Wahid Hussain | Trustee | 30 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Zubair Awan | Trustee | 17 August 2014 |
|
|
||||
RAJA JAWAID AKHTAR | Trustee | 13 December 2011 |
|
|
||||
Nadeem Akhtar | Trustee | 13 December 2011 |
|
|||||
SHAFIQ REHMAN | Trustee | 13 December 2011 |
|
|||||
MR MOHAMMAD RASHAD | Trustee | 13 December 2011 |
|
|
||||
MOHAMMAD AJAIB | Trustee | 13 December 2011 |
|
|
||||
CHAUDHRY ABDUL MAJID | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.40m | £1.13m | £1.48m | £1.59m | £1.77m | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.42m | £1.19m | £1.45m | £1.42m | £1.75m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £235.68k | £171.41k | £160.40k | £46.86k | £46.86k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £469.05k | £347.64k | £573.93k | £713.84k | £766.90k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £58.98k | £59.57k | £125.17k | £160.47k | £192.26k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £874.60k | £716.71k | £770.74k | £714.92k | £812.75k | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Other | £1.70k | £7.03k | £6.34k | £1.61k | £1.19k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £863.17k | £1.09m | £1.18m | £1.21m | £1.45m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £249.08k | £101.82k | £271.83k | £212.27k | £301.18k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | £19.16k | £10.42k | £29.48k | £15.44k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £308.41k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £5.32m | £5.29m | £5.31m | £5.38m | £5.46m | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £355.51k | £345.36k | £424.69k | £570.69k | £463.44k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £208.82k | £239.06k | £316.05k | £368.27k | £316.74k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 28 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | 28 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 17 April 2024 | 48 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | 17 April 2024 | 48 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 01 March 2023 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | 01 March 2023 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 04 November 2022 | 249 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | 04 November 2022 | 249 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 25 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | 25 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 27/10/1972 AS AMENDED ON 28/09/1973 AS AMENDED ON 08/09/1985 AS AMENDED ON 31/07/2005 AS AMENDED ON 20/07/2008 AS AMENDED ON 10/07/2011 AS AMENDED ON 18/07/2012 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 23 AUG 2015 AS AMENDED ON 17 SEP 2017
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE ISLAMIC RELIGION AND IN PARTICULAR THE SUNNI MUSLIM FAITH, AND IN FURTHERANCE OF THAT OBJECT THE MASJID MAY BE USED TO TEACH, PROPAGATE AND PREACH ISLAM ACCORDING TO SUNNI SCHOOL OF THOUGHT.
Area of benefit
LONDON BOROUGH OF HOUNSLOW
Contact information
- Address:
-
367 WELLINGTON ROAD SOUTH
HOUNSLOW
TW4 5HU
- Phone:
- 02085700938
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window