Financial history FRANK HANSCOMB DINGLE FOR PENSIONS AND AGED POOR

Charity number: 264832
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £76.59k £65.94k £66.24k £70.05k £70.37k
Total expenditure £114.03k £121.49k £132.76k £163.95k £204.34k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A