Financial history POOLE HOSPITAL CANCER TREATMENT TRUST

Charity number: 264841
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £119.51k £200.10k £176.35k £22.34k £40.27k
Total expenditure £8.20k £508.02k £7.81k £3.66k £230.39k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A