Trustees POOLE HOSPITAL CANCER TREATMENT TRUST
Charity number: 264841

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stuart Dean | Chair |
|
||||||
William Fulton | Trustee | 30 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ingrid Jones | Trustee | 11 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Mandy Tanner | Trustee | 17 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Susan Norton | Trustee | 17 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Elaine Drury | Trustee | 17 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Paddy Clement | Trustee | 23 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
Jenny Dehon | Trustee | 16 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
Greg Bemment | Trustee | 22 October 2012 |
|
|
||||
PAT WHITEHEAD | Trustee | 22 October 2012 |
|
|
||||
ADRIAN FALCK | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.