CLIFFORD HOWARTH CHARITY TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Clifford Howarth Charity Trust being a very small charity is only able to consider a small number of projects. Projects supported are community development primarily local based.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Buckinghamshire
- Cumbria
- Lancashire
- Warwickshire
Governance
- 09 January 1973: Standard registration
- CLIFFORD HOWARTH CHARITY SETTLEMENT (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jon Paul Tinning | Chair | 24 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
CARA TINNING | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.00k | £10.07k | £9.58k | £11.05k | £11.09k | |
|
Total expenditure | £57.91k | £54.10k | £10.75k | £77.04k | £962 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 12 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 07 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 21 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 28 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 17 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SETTLEMENT DATED 11TH OCTOBER 1972
Charitable objects
TO APPLY CAPITAL AND INCOME AT THE DISCRETION OF THE TRUSTEES AMONGST ANY ONE OR MORE BODY OR BODIES OF PERSONS OR TRUST OR TRUSTS ESTABLISHED IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD FOR ANY PURPOSES RECOGNISED FOR THE TIME BEING BY ENGLISH LAW AS BEING EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Coach House
Village St
Offchurch
Leamington Spa
Warwickshire
CV33 9AS
- Phone:
- 07796128959
- Email:
- jontinning@sky.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window