THE SIR DEREK GREENAWAY FOUNDATION

Charity Number: 264904
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To apply the fund to, or towards, the benefit, or in furtherance, of such charitable institutions or foundations in such manner and in such proportions as the trustees may from time to time in their discretion determine.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024

Total income: £14,766
Total expenditure: £15,282

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 27 November 1972: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:
  • "THE SIR DEREK GREENAWAY FOUNDATION" (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Mr Swan Trustee 18 March 2016
THE SIR JAMES AND LADY SCOTT TRUST
Received: On time
DAVID ROBARTS CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE GRAVELINES TRUST
Received: On time
THE HANLEY TRUST (1987)
Received: On time
THE WORKER TRUST
Received: On time
THE CLIO TRUST
Received: On time
SCOTT BOLTON TRUST
THE LEVER TRUST
Received: On time
THE JK FOUNDATION
Received: On time
THE CLIPPER FOUNDATION
Received: On time
THE WYNKCOOMBE TRUST
Received: On time
THE DRANDJEAW CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE ULANA TRUST
Received: On time
THE TINKER TRUST
Received: On time
ST ALDHELM'S CHAPEL TRUST
Received: On time
Lady Susan Margaret Greenaway Trustee 18 March 2016
FRIENDS OF LOIS WEEDON CHURCH
Received: On time
THE ST. JOHN THE BAPTIST, PLUMPTON HERITAGE TRUST
Received: On time
Sir Thomas Edward Burdick Greenaway Trustee 18 March 2016
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £13.32k £11.12k £10.56k £12.78k £14.77k
Total expenditure £12.26k £10.93k £13.83k £12.02k £15.28k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 06 February 2025 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2023 27 March 2024 51 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2022 02 March 2023 25 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2021 03 February 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2020 03 February 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
LOIS WEEDON HOUSE
LOIS WEEDON
TOWCESTER
NN12 8PJ
Phone:
01327860472
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available