THE FRIENDS OF ST.PETER'S SHAFTESBURY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Support the upkeep,enhancment and interpretation of the historic church building of St Peters Shaftesbury for the benefit of the whole community of the town as well as visitors
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Dorset
Governance
- 08 May 1973: Standard registration
- THE FRIENDS OF SAINT PETER'S (Previous name)
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAVID PEARSON | Chair | 21 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
Keith Gunn | Trustee | 28 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Brian Keith Aylen | Trustee | 14 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Susan Vera Minshaw | Trustee | 04 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
MRS CHRISTINE MITCHEL | Trustee | 11 August 2013 |
|
|
||||
JOHN PARKER | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.94k | £1.51k | £1.77k | £3.64k | £1.74k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.66k | £2.43k | £746 | £13.21k | £829 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 04 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 19 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 10 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 25 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 07 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 14TH MARCH 1973 AS AMENDED ON 17 MAY 1978
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT FOR THE FOLLOWING PURPOSES IN THE AREA COMPRISING SHAFTESBURY AND DISTRICT A) TO SECURE THE RESTORATION AND PRESERVATION OF THE CHURCH AND TO ACQUIRE MANAGE AND MAINTAIN AND USE THE CHURCH FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PEOPLE OF SHAFTESBURY AND DISTRICT B) TO STIMULATE PUBLIC INTEREST IN THE CHURCH OF SAINT PETER'S IN SHAFTESBURY.
Area of benefit
SHAFTESBURY AND DISTRICT
Contact information
- Address:
-
4 BOYNE MEAD
SHAFTESBURY
SP7 8HT
- Phone:
- 01747855306
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window