THE CARON TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
GRANTS TO CHARITABLE ORGANISATIONS
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 30 January 1973: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SIR ROY GOODE | Chair |
|
|
|||||
NAOMI GOODE | Trustee | 01 January 2000 |
|
|
||||
LADY CATHERINE ANNE GOODE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.10k | £19.33k | £18.34k | £8.65k | £10.82k | |
|
Total expenditure | £181.65k | £195.00k | £152.00k | £115.50k | £55.60k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 01 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 28 May 2024 | 113 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 03 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 14 March 2022 | 37 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 27 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED DATED 16TH NOVEMBER 1972
Charitable objects
FOR OR TO SUCH CHARITABLE OBJECTS (AND IF MORE THAN ONE IN SUCH SHARES AND AS TO INCOME FOR SUCH PERIOD CONTINUOUS OR DISCONTINUOUS) AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
42 ST. JOHN STREET
OXFORD
OX1 2LH
- Phone:
- 01865515494
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window