Financial history CORSCOMBE VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 264959
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £9.86k £29.99k £7.18k £10.60k £8.76k
Total expenditure £9.72k £5.39k £9.51k £9.25k £10.92k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £27.43k N/A £50 N/A