CORSCOMBE VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing premises for village organisations, playgroup & toddler group, & a venue for communal functions, drama presentations & private parties, wedding receptions etc
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Other Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Dorset
Governance
- 05 January 1973: Standard registration
No other names
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PAUL NIGEL RENDELL | Chair | 10 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
Robert Philip Land | Trustee | 27 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTOPHER GEORGE CHILDS | Trustee | 05 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kelvin Stanley Braithwaite | Trustee | 25 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT FEAR | Trustee | 04 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
CONSTANCE ROSEMARY LOVEGROVE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.86k | £29.99k | £7.18k | £10.60k | £8.76k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.72k | £5.39k | £9.51k | £9.25k | £10.92k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £27.43k | N/A | £50 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 20 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 27 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 11 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 27 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 27 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 20 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 20TH OCTOBER 1972
Charitable objects
FOR THE PURPOSES OF A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF CORSCOMBE IN THE COUNTY OF DORSET WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS INCLUDING USE FOR MEETINGS LECTURES AND CLASSES AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF CORSCOMBE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Comforts Orchard
Corscombe
DORCHESTER
DT2 0NX
- Phone:
- 01935891415
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window