Governing document THE BRITISH WHEEL OF YOGA
Charity number: 264993
Removed charity
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION AND RULES ADOPTED 1ST SEPTEMBER 1972 AMENDED 25TH AUGUST 1973, 7TH APRIL 1979, 9TH APRIL 1983, 14TH APRIL 1985, AND 12TH APRIL 1987. AS AMENDED 13 SEPTEMBER 1997
Charitable objects
A. TO ENCOURAGE AND HELP ALL PERSONS TO A GREATER KNOWLEDG AND UNDERSTANDING OF ALL ASPECTS OF RESEARCH, STUDY, EDUCATION AND TRAINING. B. TO MAINTAIN AND IMPROVE THE STANDARD OF TEACHING. C. TO CO-OPERATE WITH AND SUPPORT OTHER ORGANISATIONS HAVING SIMILAR OBJECTS.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.