LEWISHAM POLISH CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Lewisham Polish Centre tries to help people of Polish origin to adjust to life in London, help those of old age, sick or disabled; help in gaining better education and maintaining usage of Polish language; relieve the poverty amongst the beneficiaries; cultivate Roman Catholic faith.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Bexley
- Bromley
- Croydon
- Greenwich
- Lambeth
- Lewisham
- Southwark
Governance
- 04 January 1973: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Agnieszka Maria Lokaj | Trustee | 23 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Tomasz Zarzycki | Trustee | 17 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Remigiusz Szarama | Trustee | 02 December 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £18.62k | £20.75k | £92.09k | £59.69k | £27.04k | |
|
Total expenditure | £15.34k | £10.81k | £33.38k | £116.95k | £23.96k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 15 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 15 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 24 May 2024 | 114 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 24 May 2024 | 114 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 19 February 2023 | 19 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 19 February 2023 | 19 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 14 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 22 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 20 NOVEMBER 1972 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 12/12/2015
Charitable objects
CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF PERSONS OF POLISH EXTRACTION, AND THEIR RELATIVES, LIVING IN SOUTH EAST LONDON. THE MAIN OBJECTIVES ARE: 1. THE RELIEF AND ASSISTANCE OF THE AGED SICK AND DISABLED BENEFICIARIES. 2. TO ASSIST BENEFICIARIES AND THEIR CHILDREN TO ACQUIRE A BETTER EDUCATION BOTH IN THE BRITISH AND POLISH EDUCATION SYSTEMS, INCLUDING LEARNING THE POLISH LANGUAGE AND LEARNING ABOUT POLISH CULTURE AND CUSTOMS. 3. THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AMONGST BENEFICIARIES. 4. THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE ROMAN CATHOLIC FAITH AND ROMAN CATHOLIC CHARITABLE INSTITUTIONS.
Area of benefit
SOUTH EAST LONDON
Contact information
- Address:
-
8 WALDRAM PARK ROAD
LONDON
SE23 2PN
- Phone:
- 07837936690
- Email:
- info@lpcuk.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window