THE EDWARD DRUMMOND HAY FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO ASSIST BRITISH CITIZENS RESIDENT IN TANGIER, OR IF SUCH FUNDING IS NOT REQUIRED IN ANY YEAR, TO ASSIST BRITISH CITIZENS RESIDENT ELSEWHERE IN MOROCCO.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2014
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Morocco
Governance
- 21 February 1973: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAVID FLINT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Timothy Morris | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PATRICIA ERZINI | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2009 | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.47k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £1.00k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 92 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 92 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 458 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 458 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 823 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 823 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1188 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1188 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1553 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1553 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 12TH OCTOBER 1972 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 6TH OCTOBER 1980 AND 21ST OCTOBER 1992
Charitable objects
(1) IN THE PROMOTION OF ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF BRITISH CITIZENS WHO ARE RESIDENT IN THE PROVINCE OF TANGIER, IN THE KINGDOM OF MOROCCO. (2) IF AND IN SO FAR AS THE SAID INCOME IS NOT REQUIRED IN ANY YEAR FOR APPLICATION IN MANNER AFORESAID THE TRUSTEES SHALL APPLY THE SAME IN THE PROMOTION OF ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENFIT OF BRITISH CITIZENS WHO ARE RESIDENT ELSEWHERE IN THE SAID KINGDOM OF MOROCCO.
Area of benefit
TANGIER
Contact information
- Address:
-
PO Box 1203
Tangier
90000
Morocco
- Phone:
- 00212661093411
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window