THE TAILWAGGERS CLUB TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
1, Grants to Animal Welfare Organisations to assist with new equipment and maintenance. 2, Grants to private individuals to assist with veterinary bills arising from essential treatment to their pets.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2015
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Animals
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 08 March 1973: Standard registration
- 19 July 2016: Removed (Amalgamated)
- 19 July 2016: Funds transferred to 227523 DOGS TRUST LEGACY
- TAILWAGGERS (Working name)
- THE TAIL WAGGERS' CLUB TRUST (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £41.19k | £13.20k | £37.26k | £11.05k | £20.59k | |
|
Total expenditure | £26.12k | £20.52k | £26.53k | £29.36k | £31.53k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | 12 January 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2014 | 27 January 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2014 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | 27 January 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | 27 January 2014 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 22 NOVEMBER 1972, ORDER OF THE CHARITY COMMISSIONERS DATED 22 JULY 2004. AMENDMENT MADE BY RESOLUTIONS DATED 12 OCTOBER 2004 AND 9 JULY 2007.
Charitable objects
PREVENTING CRUELTY TO DOMESTIC ANIMALS AND GENERALLY PROTECTING THEM AGAINST MISUSE AND ABUSE OF EVERY KIND INCLUDING RESEARCH (OTHER THAN BY MEANS OF VIVISECTION) INTO DISEASES AND NUTRITION OF DOMESTIC ANIMALS; EDUCATING THE PUBLIC GENERALLY IN THE PROPER CARE AND TREATMENT OF DOMESTIC ANIMALS; AND TO PROVIDE VARIOUS SERVICES IN CONNECTION WITH VETERINARY HOSPITALS, SURGEONS, AND SCIENCE, AND THE CARE OF DOMESTIC ANIMALS. (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 3 OF TRUST DEED DATED 22ND NOVEMBER 1972).
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window