LEAGUE OF FRIENDS OF THE ROYAL VICTORIA HOSPITAL FOLKESTONE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
As per the Charity Charter of the League of Friends of the Royal Victoria Hospital. To raise funds to support the work of the Royal Victoria Hospital, by operating a support mechanism to fund hospital facilities, equipment and financial assistance.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 28 February 2022
People

8 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Kent
Governance
- 02 March 1973: Standard registration
- LEAGUE OF FRIENDS ROYAL VICTORIA HOSPITAL (Working name)
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Susanne Zintel | Trustee | 18 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Susan Pitman | Trustee | 05 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Bernadette Pay | Trustee | 06 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Kay ROSS | Trustee | 27 December 2014 |
|
|
||||
DAVID JOHN PEARSON | Trustee | 22 June 2012 |
|
|
||||
LESLEY DOWLEY | Trustee | 23 June 2011 |
|
|
||||
Lynn Whaley | Trustee | 23 April 1999 |
|
|
||||
LORNA WALKER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 28/02/2018 | 28/02/2019 | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £66.32k | £64.89k | £64.89k | £4.71k | £15.87k | |
|
Total expenditure | £80.64k | £60.65k | £54.10k | £15.22k | £13.98k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 150 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 150 days | |
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 517 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 517 days | |
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 11 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 24 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 26 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | 26 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 21ST FEBRUARY 1972
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE PATIENTS AND FORMER PATIENTS OF THE ROYAL VICTORIA HOSPITAL FOLKESTONE WHO ARE SICK, CONVALESCENT, DISABLED, HANDICAPPED, INFIRM OR IN NEED OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE AND GENERALLY, TO SUPPORT THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE SAID HOSPITAL.
Area of benefit
FOLKESTONE AND DISTRICT
Contact information
- Address:
-
120 Capel Street
Capel-le-Ferne
Folkestone
CT18 7HB
- Phone:
- 07956260951
- Email:
- lesley.dowley@sky.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window