THE BRITISH GELBVIEH CATTLE SOCIETY
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
CATTLE BREED SOCIETY
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2017
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
Governance
- 14 June 1972: Standard registration
- 09 February 2015: Removed (Does not operate)
- 17 March 2015: Re-registered
- 09 February 2020: Removed (Does not operate)
- THE GELBVIEH CATTLE SOCIETY OF GREAT BRITAIN LIMITED (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2013 | 31/08/2014 | 31/08/2015 | 31/08/2016 | 31/08/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £875 | £3.27k | £2.33k | £1.55k | £202 | |
|
Total expenditure | £652 | £3.75k | £2.36k | £1.72k | £315 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2017 | 22 June 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2016 | 19 April 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2016 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 2ND FEBRURARY 1973 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED19TH FEBRUARY 1986 AND 9TH NOVEMBER 1988
Charitable objects
TO ENCOURAGE AND PROMOTE AND IMPROVE THE BREEDING OF GELBVIEH CATTLE IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND TO PURCHAS IMPORT EXPORT OF ACQUIRE HOLD AND RESELL CATTLE OF THIS BREED.
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window