NNF TRUST 2015
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Support of Arts, Education and Culture and in particular support of the annual Norfolk and Norwich Festival
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2015
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Norfolk
Governance
- 14 March 1973: Standard registration
- 04 May 2017: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 04 May 2017: Funds transferred to 1164424 NORFOLK AND NORWICH FESTIVAL TRUST
- NORFOLK AND NORWICH FESTIVAL TRUST (Working name)
- NORFOLK AND NORWICH FESTIVAL TRUST (Previous name)
- NORFOLK AND NORWICH TRIENNIAL MUSICAL FESTIVAL TRUST (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 31/12/2014 | 31/12/2015 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £18.92k | £38.31k | £33.92k | £123.49k | £302.19k | |
|
Total expenditure | £16.91k | £49.72k | £55.56k | £8.85k | £66.67k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2015 | 29 July 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2015 | 21 September 2016 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2014 | 04 August 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2014 | 04 August 2015 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2014 | 19 December 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2014 | 19 December 2014 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 23 MAY 1955 AS AMENDED ON 06 DEC 2004 AS AMENDED ON 14 APR 2016
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE MAINTAIN IMPROVE AND ADVANCE EDUCATION PARTICULARLY BY THE ENCOURAGMENT OF THE ARTS OF SINGING AND MUSIC AND DRAMA AND BALLET.
Area of benefit
COUNTY OF NORFOLK AND THE CITY AND COUNTY OF NORWICH
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window