Financial history MIKRON THEATRE COMPANY LIMITED

Charity Number: 265169
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/11/2020 30/11/2021 30/11/2022 30/11/2023 30/11/2024
Total gross income £220.74k £342.85k £325.83k £364.66k £350.80k
Total expenditure £168.42k £268.72k £309.16k £340.17k £288.43k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £120.18k £48.46k £64.67k £0